CA AB1956 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 42999.2 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: woody biomass: collection and conversion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 21). |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 42999.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |