CA AB1954 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on August 30 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-11 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6608.5 and 6609.1 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to sexually violent predators.
Title
Sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1954 Alanis Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1954 Alanis et al. By Grove (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1954 Alanis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1954 Alanis et al. By Grove (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1954 Alanis Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-11 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-05-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E.M. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.M. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.M. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6608.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 6609.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |