CA AB1929 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14132 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal benefits: violence prevention services.
Sponsors
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Assembly - AB 1929 Gabriel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1929 Gabriel et al. By Portantino (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1929 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1929 Gabriel et al. By Portantino (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1929 Gabriel Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-16 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5810.). |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4678.). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16). |
2022-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 0. Page 4984.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |