CA AB1927 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-29 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 69505.7 to the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
Student financial aid: debit cards.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Assembly - AB 1927 FRAZIER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1927 Frazier By Evans (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Banking and Financial Institution (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1927 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1927 Frazier By Evans (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Banking and Financial Institution (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1927 FRAZIER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Banking and Finance (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-29 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6646.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 6659.). |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4895.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 25). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11). |
2014-06-04 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and B. & F.I. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 5011.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 14). |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 28). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and B. & F. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69505.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |