CA AB1924 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12305.82 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.
Title
In-Home Supportive Services: fraud.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1924&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1901-1950/ab_1924_bill_20100216_introduced.html |