CA AB1916 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12012.95 to the Government Code, relating to gaming.
Title
Tribal Gaming.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Special Consent #19 AB1916 Hall (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1916 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AB 1916 HALL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 600, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4903.). |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4760.) |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12012.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |