CA AB1904 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 24617 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Transit buses: yield right-of-way sign.
Sponsors
Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 23. |
2024-01-23 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 24617 | Amended Code | Citation Text |