CA AB19 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 12098.2 of the Government Code, relating to economic development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor's Office of Business and Economic Development: small business: regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-28AssemblyIn committee: Held under submission.
2015-05-20AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2015-05-07AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2015-05-06AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2015-05-05AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2015-04-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2015-04-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2015-04-21AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-03-17AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2015-03-16AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
2015-03-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2014-12-02AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 1.
2014-12-01AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12098.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback