CA AB1887 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6254 and 11126 of the Government Code, and to add and repeal Part 6.7 (commencing with Section 12739.70) of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Temporary high risk pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1887 Villines Urgency Clause (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - AB 1887 VILLINES Third Reading Urgency (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Assembly - AB 1887 VILLINES Third Reading Urgency (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 32, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-06-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-06-29 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:45 a.m. | |
2010-06-28 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-06-28 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4089.) | |
2010-06-21 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-06-17 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 17). | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 16). Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3917.) | |
2010-06-15 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-06-14 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-14 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5649.) | |
2010-06-10 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5628.). | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-29 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-28 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-27 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 20). | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2010-02-17 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Read first time. To print. |