CA AB1883 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 8220.1 and 8222 of, and to add Section 8209.5 to, the Education Code, relating to child care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care and development services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1883 WEBER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2018-08-06SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and V.A.
2018-06-04SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2018-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5601.)
2018-05-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2018-05-25AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-04-25AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on V.A.
2018-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2018-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20).
2018-03-12AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2018-03-08AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2018-03-06AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Coms. on HUM. S. and V.A.
2018-01-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
2018-01-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code8209.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code8220.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code8222Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code18936New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback