CA AB186 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 46, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 46, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act amend Sections 1324.29 and 1324.30 of, and to add 1276.66 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 31005 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 14114, 14126.023, 14126.032, 14126.033, 14126.036, and 14197.2 of, to amend and repeal Section 14126.022 of, and to add Sections 14126.024 and 14126.026 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Public health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Assembly - AB 186 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB186 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 186 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB186 BUDGET (Ting) By Skinner (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Assembly - AB 186 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 46, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-06-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 p.m. | |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 17.). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4523.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (June 27). |
2022-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 504.) |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 17. Page 432.) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2021-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2021-01-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. |
2021-01-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1276.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1324.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 31005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14114 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.022 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.023 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.024 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.026 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14126.036 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |