CA AB1859 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7500.1, 7504, 7507.3, and 7507.13 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to collateral recovery.
Title
Collateral recovery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Assembly - AB 1859 GALLAGHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1859 Gallagher By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1859 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1859 Gallagher By Bates (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - Assembly - AB 1859 GALLAGHER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-11 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 509, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-06 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6351.). |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5263.). |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4869.) |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 12). |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7500.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7506.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7506.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7507.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7507.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7507.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7507.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7508.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 22651.03 | New Code | See Bill Text |