CA AB1856 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 6902.6, 9152.3, 30362.2, 32402.3, 40112.3, 41101.3, 43452.3, 45652.3, 46502.3, 50140.3, 55222.3, and 60522.3 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Excise taxes: claim for refund: timely filed claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1856 Dababneh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1856 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1856 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 98, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4650.). |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4593.) |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 30362.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 32402.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 40112.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41101.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 43452.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 45652.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 46502.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 50140.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 55222.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 60522.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6902.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 9152.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |