CA AB1854 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27317 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: inflatable restraint systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1854 Brownley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1854 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1854 BROWNLEY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 97, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-06-28 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-06-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4182.). | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-13 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2012-05-10 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-10 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4788.) | |
2012-05-07 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-03 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-05-02 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 27317 | Amended Code | Citation Text |