CA AB1842 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10553.1, 11330.7, 11364, 11387, 11405, 11461.36, 11462.04, and 16121 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, and to amend Section 43 of Chapter 35 of the Statutes of 2018, relating to human services, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Human services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1842 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1842 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5262.) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5115.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10553.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11330.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11364 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11387 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11461.36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11462.04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |