CA AB1840 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 301.4 of the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Corporations: boards of directors: underrepresented communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 301.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |