CA AB1835 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-20 - From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 17211 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.
Title
Unfair competition: exemption.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Logue [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |
2010-04-13 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-06 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2010-02-16 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | |
2010-02-12 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1835&sess=0910&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/asm/ab_1801-1850/ab_1835_bill_20100212_introduced.html |