CA AB1832 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9847, 19829.9848, and 22944.5 of, and to add Sections 20683.6, 20683.61, 20683.62, 20683.7, 20683.71, 20683.72, and 22958.1.7 to, the Government Code, relating to state public employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State public employment: memorandum of understanding: approval: State Bargaining Units 9 and 10.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1832 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1832 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 28). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.4 suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5779.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5778.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5777.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (June 18). |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4554.) |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5110.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |