CA AB1828 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2018 (Chapters 29 and 30 of the Statutes of 2018) by amending Items 0250-001-0932, 0250-101-0932, 0509-001-0001, 0540-001-6076, 0650-001-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0820-001-0001, 0890-101-0001, 2740-001-0044, 3340-001-0318, 3540-001-0140, 3760-101-3228, 3940-001-0001, 3940-101-0001, 5180-101-0001, 5180-151-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-119-0890, 6100-134-0890, 6100-136-0890, 6100-137-0890, 6100-194-0890, 6100-197-0890, 6100-295-0001, 6100-485, 6100-488, 6120-011-0001, 6440-001-0001, 6870-295-0001, 8570-001-0001, and 8660-101-0493 of, and adding Items 3760-490, 3900-011-3119, 3940-002-0001, 6120-140-0001, 6120-141-0001, and 8660-495 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1828 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - AB 1828 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 50 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 28). |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5779.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5778.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Joint Rule 61 suspended. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5777.) |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 16). |
2018-08-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-08-13 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 5262.) |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 22. Page 5108.) |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 18. Page 5026.) |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |