CA AB1826 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12715 of the Government Code, relating to tribal gaming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tribal gaming: local agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1826 G.O. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
2019-07-11SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-11SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-07-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1480.)
2019-04-29AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-03-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 21.
2019-03-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12715Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback