CA AB1816 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-30 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2.9 (commencing with Section 50492) to Part 2 of Division 31 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.
Title
Reentry Housing and Workforce Development Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Luz Rivas [D] | Asm. Mia Bonta [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1816 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Assembly - AB 1816 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2022-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (March 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 50492 | New Code | See Bill Text |