CA AB1812 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7583.32 and 7585.2 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Private security services: firearms requalification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7583.32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7585.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |