CA AB1810 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 12 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10326.2 of the Public Contract Code, to amend Sections 120050 and 180257 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 372 and 2101 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 12509.5, 12804.9, 23229, and 34621 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation: omnibus bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1810 TRANS. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By FRAZIER (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1810 TRANS. (Frazier) By Beall (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - AB 1810 TRANS. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Accountability and Administrative Review] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2019-09-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-11SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-10SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 10)
2019-09-09SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-09-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-31SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-07-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-06-25SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-17SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-06-06SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-29SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and G.O.
2019-05-16SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1773.)
2019-05-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and A. & A.R.
2019-03-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 4.
2019-03-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback