CA AB1809 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 9.4 (commencing with Section 7199.5) to Division 3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to home inspections.
Title
Home inspections: energy audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1809 SMYTH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1809 Smyth By Strickland (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1809 SMYTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1809 Smyth By Strickland (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1809 SMYTH Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 453, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6520.) | |
2010-08-12 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4491.) | |
2010-08-04 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-03 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-07-01 | From Special Consent Calendar pursuant to Joint Rule 22.2. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-06-30 | Read second time. To third reading. Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2010-06-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). | |
2010-06-23 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Corrected June 29.) | |
2010-06-16 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-06-14 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-05-13 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2010-04-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-29 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4928.) | |
2010-04-26 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 4851.). | |
2010-03-25 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-03-24 | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-03-23 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2010-03-16 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-03-15 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-25 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2010-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2010-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |