CA AB1804 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 396 to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Insurance: notice of lapse.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-18 - Assembly - AB 1804 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1804 Perea By Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1804 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-13 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1804 Perea By Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1804 PEREA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 380, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 6099.). |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4466.). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 5327.) |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5218.) |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4939.) |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 396 | New Code | See Bill Text |