CA AB1797 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 50783, 50784, and 50786 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobilehome Park Purchase Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1797 TORRES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1797 Torres By Correa (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1797 TORRES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-25 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 558, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-25 Approved by the Governor.
2012-09-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
2012-08-27 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 28. Page 6305.).
2012-08-22 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-08-22 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 4696.).
2012-08-08 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-08-07 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
2012-06-26 Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-06-25 From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 19).
2012-06-07 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-05-29 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-05-29 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 5047.)
2012-05-25 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-05-09 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2012-04-25 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2012-04-23 Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2012-04-19 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
2012-03-01 Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2012-02-22 From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
2012-02-21 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code50783Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50784Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50786Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1797&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20120221_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20120419_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20120626_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20120831_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_bill_20120925_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20120425_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20120525_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20120529_0258PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20120619_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20120806_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20120822_0139PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1751-1800/ab_1797_vote_20120827_0200PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback