CA AB1793 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7031 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors: license requirements: recovery actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 1793 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB1793 Holden (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1793 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Special Consent AB1793 Holden (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1793 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary to Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 244, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5809.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4878.). |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4784.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |