CA AB1788 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 214.1 and 214.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxation: welfare exemption: course of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-23 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-05-22 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-05-21 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). | |
2012-04-16 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2012-04-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2012-02-22 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2012-02-21 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |