CA AB1788 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 579, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 579, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12585.7 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water development projects: state financial assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1788 YAMADA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1788 Yamada By Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1788 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1788 Yamada By Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-02 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-01 - Assembly - AB 1788 YAMADA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass. (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 579, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6472.) | |
2010-08-19 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-19 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4685.) | |
2010-08-17 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14). | |
2010-08-02 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. | |
2010-07-15 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-07-01 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29). | |
2010-06-16 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2010-06-01 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-01 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5402.) | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-03-23 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |
2010-02-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 13. | |
2010-02-10 | Read first time. To print. |