CA AB1787 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 54954.3 of the Government Code, relating to open meetings.
Title
Open meetings: public comments: translation.
Sponsors
Asm. Jimmy Gomez [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1787 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 69 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1787 Gomez By Nguyen (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 1787 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1787 Gomez By Nguyen (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Assembly - AB 1787 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 507, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 9. Page 6422.). |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) . |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4973.). |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4263.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12812.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54594.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 54954.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |