CA AB1781 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 7.1 (commencing with Section 1964) of Division 2.5 of the Streets and Highways Code, and to amend Sections 21251 and 21260 of the Vehicle Code, relating to neighborhood electric vehicles.
Title
Neighborhood electric vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Assembly - AB 1781 VILLINES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1781 Villines By Cogdill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1781 VILLINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1781 Villines By Cogdill (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Assembly - AB 1781 VILLINES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 452, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2010-08-26 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6373.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6383.) | |
2010-08-18 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2010-08-18 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4586.) | |
2010-08-12 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-08-11 | Read third time, amended. To second reading. | |
2010-07-01 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2010-06-30 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. | |
2010-06-28 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-06-16 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 15). | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-04-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-04-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4821.) | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14). | |
2010-03-25 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-03-24 | Read second time and amended. | |
2010-03-23 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 22). | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-02-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 12. | |
2010-02-09 | Read first time. To print. |