CA AB1780 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 951, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 951, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 600 of the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Corporations: shareholders’ meetings: remote communication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1780 Chen Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1780 Chen By Dahle (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AB 1780 Chen Third Reading Urgency (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1780 Chen By Dahle (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Assembly - AB 1780 Chen Third Reading Urgency (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 951, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5104.). |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From Special Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4258.). |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 28). |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2022-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |