CA AB1779 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 786.5 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Theft: jurisdiction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 786.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |