CA AB1776 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 927.2, 927.6, 927.7, and 927.11 of the Government Code, relating to resource conservation districts.
Title
Resource conservation districts: California Prompt Payment Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1776 Gallagher et al. By Nielsen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1776 Gallagher Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 1776 Gallagher Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 455, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4907.). |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4961.) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file. |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2022-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 927.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 927.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 927.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 927.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |