CA AB1774 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 654.1, 655.5, 1206, 1206.6, 1220, 1244, 1246.5, 1271.1, 1272, 1300, 1301, and 1320 of, to add Section 1272.1 to, to repeal Sections 1241.1, 1265, 1265.1, 1266, 1267, 1268, 1272.4, 1272.6, 1281, 1300.1, 1324, and 1325 of, and to repeal and add Sections 1223, 1227, and 1310 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 9272 of the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 1206 and 1600.3 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14043.27 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to clinical laboratories.
Title
Clinical laboratories: licensure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 19). |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 5. |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |