CA AB1773 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 3706 and 3707 to the Fish and Game Code, relating to migratory birds.
Title
Migratory birds: Pacific Flyway: report.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. In committee: Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set. | |
2012-03-29 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2012-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3706 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3707 | New Code | See Bill Text |