CA AB1760 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 4721 to the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Parking: emergency vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 1 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
2018-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, final hearing. Failed passage.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-02-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-01-05AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee February 4.
2018-01-04AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code4721New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback