CA AB1755 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21200 of the Vehicle Code, relating to bikeways.
Title
Bicycle operation.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R] | Asm. Heath Flora [R] | Asm. Dante Acosta [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1755 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1755 STEINORTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - AB 1755 STEINORTH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 139, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-07-03 | Senate | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5038.). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4898.) |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18). |
2018-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |