CA AB1755 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 506, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 506, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 4.9 (commencing with Section 12400) to Division 6 of the Water Code, relating to water data.
Title
The Open and Transparent Water Data Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1755 DODD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1755 Dodd By Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1755 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1755 Dodd By Pavley (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-01 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1755 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 506, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6288.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5227.). |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5065.) |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 4. Page 5022.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4943.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-02-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 4. |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 12400 | New Code | See Bill Text |