CA AB1754 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 8236.02 and 8236.04 to the Education Code, relating to early care and education.
Title
State full-day preschool program: eligibility for enrollment: low income schools.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] | Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1754 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1754 MCCARTY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 11. Page 5460.) |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 25). |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8205.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8236.02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8236.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |