CA AB1744 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-16 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8421 and 8482.3 of, and to add Sections 8429, 8484.66, and 8484.76 to, the Education Code, and to amend Section 34019 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to after school programs.
Title
After school programs: substance use prevention: funding: cannabis revenue.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1744 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AB 1744 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-25 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5213.) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 9). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2018-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HEALTH. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 8421 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8429 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8482.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 8484.66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 8484.76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 34019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |