CA AB1738 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cortese.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-12 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cortese.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 13040) of Chapter 1 of Division 6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Mobile Homeless Connect Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1738 Wendy Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1738 Wendy Carrillo Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Cortese. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | From special consent calendar |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2045.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and H. & C.D. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 13040 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |