CA AB1735 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 67, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 67, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 215 of the Family Code, relating to dissolution of marriage.
Title
Dissolution of marriage: bifurcated judgment: service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1735 Waldron (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1735 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1735 WALDRON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 67, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4645.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4627.) |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 215 | Amended Code | Citation Text |