CA AB1730 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 3345 of the Civil Code, relating to penal damages.
Title
Penal damages: veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1730 Davies et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - AB 1730 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - AB 1730 Davies Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 78, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-06-29 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4307.). |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 31). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and M. & V.A. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3916.) |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 15). |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 3345 | Amended Code | Citation Text |