CA AB1727 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1725.5 of the Labor Code, relating to public works.
Title
Public works: fees: small business.
Sponsors
Asm. Jose Medina [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 3. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 1725.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |