CA AB1725 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-21 - Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7507 to the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Inmates: HIV testing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-04-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-08 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8). | |
2010-04-05 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |
2010-03-09 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-03-08 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2010-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |