CA AB1720 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2837.5, 2837.6, and 2837.7 to the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 80010, 80200, and 80260 of, to add Sections 80001, 80002.6, 80013, and 80201 to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 80125) to Chapter 2 of Division 27 of, the Water Code, relating to energy, and to make an appropriation therefor.
Title
Energy: long-duration energy storage: procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1720 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1720 Carrillo Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2020-06-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-29 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hertzberg. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1479.) |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2837.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2837.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2837.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 80001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 80002.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 80010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 80013 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 80200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 80201 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 80260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |