CA AB1717 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 885, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 885, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 431 of, and to add and repeal Section 319 of, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Section 41020 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 41030 of, to add and repeal Section 41033 of, and to add and repeal Part 21 (commencing with Section 42001) and Part 21.1 (commencing with Section 42100) of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to telecommunications, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Telecommunications: prepaid mobile telephony services: state surcharge and fees: local charges collection.
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1717 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 70 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1717 Perea Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1717 PEREA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1717 Perea Urgency Clause (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1717 PEREA Third Reading Urgency (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 885, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 6571.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 6583.). |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 4855.). |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-22 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and GOV. & F. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5325.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 5340.). |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5219.) |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-21 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and REV. & TAX. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2014-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 224.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 319 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 431 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41030 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 41033 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 42100 | New Code | See Bill Text |