CA AB1708 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 459.5 and 490.2 of, to add Section 666.1 to, and to add Chapter 2.97 (commencing with Section 1001.98) to Title 6 of Part 2 of, the Penal Code, relating to theft.
Title
Theft.
Sponsors
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D] | Sen. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Asm. Bill Essayli [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Asm. Evan Low [D] | Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D] | Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D] | Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 459.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 490.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 666.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |