CA AB1707 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 174, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1752.1 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Registered dental assistants: practical examination.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-07-20 - Assembly - AB 1707 LOW Concurrence - Urgency Added By BROUGH (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1707 Low By Pan Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1707 B. & P. Assembly Third Reading By LOW (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 174, Statutes of 2017.
2017-08-07 Approved by the Governor.
2017-07-31AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-07-20AssemblyUrgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2637.).
2017-07-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 2636.)
2017-07-20AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2017-07-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-07-20SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2120.).
2017-07-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-07-17SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2017-07-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-06-08SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-05-31SenateIntroduced measure version corrected.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1850.)
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-05-03AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2017-03-03AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee April 2.
2017-03-02AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback